SD SB20 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2021 S.J. 285
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateSigned by the Governor on February 18, 2021 S.J. 285
2021-02-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 235
2021-02-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 257
2021-02-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 218
2021-02-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 10. H.J. 198
2021-02-02HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 2
2021-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 130
2021-01-25SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 105
2021-01-22SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 97
2021-01-21SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 90
2021-01-20SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-01-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback