SD SB20 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Delivered Style and Form S.J. 568
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a monitor to review and respond to complaints related to the care provided to youth in the custody or care of certain care facilities, treatment centers, and programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create a monitor to review and respond to complaints related to the care provided to youth in the custody or care of certain care facilities, treatment centers, and programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-30 - House - House Approval of style and form veto (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseDelivered Style and Form S.J. 568
2020-03-30HouseApproval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 631
2020-03-30HouseVetoed for Style and Form on March 23, 2020 S.J. 556
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 583
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the President S.J. 475
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 529
2020-03-05HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-03-05HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
2020-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-27HouseReferred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 432
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading House
2020-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 145
2020-02-05SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 145 Amendment 20C
2020-02-04SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 131
2020-01-30SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 115
2020-01-29SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 107
2020-01-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 98
2020-01-27SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0.
2020-01-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-14SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 10

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=20&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/61848.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/66706.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69838.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/70246.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32026&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32415&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34448&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34632&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=35045&Session=2020

Bill Comments

feedback