SD SB20 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Update certain provisions regarding consumer protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Update certain provisions regarding consumer protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 130
2019-01-16SenateRemove from Consent Calendar S.J. 107
2019-01-15SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-15SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 95
2019-01-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 24

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback