SD SB194 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a Wind Energy Competitive Advisory Task Force and to provide for the appointment of the task force members.
Title
Create a Wind Energy Competitive Advisory Task Force and to provide for the appointment of the task force members.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] |
Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 682 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 663 | |
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 13. H.J. 646 | |
2011-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 594 | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-15 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 396 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 419 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 402 | |
2011-02-09 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 372 | |
2011-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 246 |