SD SB193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 20. S.J. 585
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 20. S.J. 585
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require certain local governmental units to cooperate with federal agencies and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Require certain local governmental units to cooperate with federal agencies and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Lance Russell [R] | Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Rep. Blaine Campbell [R] |
Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Steve Livermont [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 20. S.J. 585 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 585 Amendment 193wa |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 547 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 419 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 326 |