SD SB193 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 646
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 646
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2012 and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2012 and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee report not adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 646 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 642 Amendment cc193A | |
2012-03-01 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 709 Amendment Cc193A | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 627 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 681 | |
2012-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 655 | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 627 | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 193bb | |
2012-02-27 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 193ub | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 487 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 420 | |
2012-02-10 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 360 | |
2012-02-10 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 193oa | |
2012-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 194 |