SD SB191 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 18. H.J. 520
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provide an appropriation for a study regarding the future renovation and expansion of the Meat Laboratory on the campus of South Dakota State University and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide an appropriation for a study regarding the future renovation and expansion of the Meat Laboratory on the campus of South Dakota State University and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - Tabled (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 18. H.J. 520
2021-03-04HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 493
2021-03-03HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 483
2021-03-02SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 377
2021-02-24JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 8. J.J. 1
2021-02-24JointCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed J.J. 1 Amendment 191A
2021-02-24JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
2021-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 169
2021-02-03SenatePrime Sponsor Changed at the Request of the Prime Sponsor S.J. 169

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback