SD SB19 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 18. S.J. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal presumptive probation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal presumptive probation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 18. S.J. 480
2019-02-21SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 445
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 24

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback