SD SB19 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase expenditure authority to accommodate donations to projects at Black Hills State University and Northern State University, to authorize the acquisition and renovation of improved real property for a project at Dakota State University, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Increase expenditure authority to accommodate donations to projects at Black Hills State University and Northern State University, to authorize the acquisition and renovation of improved real property for a project at Dakota State University, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 |
2014-03-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568 |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 660 |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by President S.J. 540 |
2014-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 609 |
2014-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 594 |
2014-02-26 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 566 |
2014-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 490 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 387 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 369 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 19fta |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 322 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 19fa |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 16 |