SD SB19 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 673
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase contributions related to the optional spouse protection program within the South Dakota Retirement System and to prohibit any new enrollments in the program.
Title
Increase contributions related to the optional spouse protection program within the South Dakota Retirement System and to prohibit any new enrollments in the program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Signed by Governor S.J. 673 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 632 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 801 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 603 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 703 | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 669 | |
2010-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 199 | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 138 | |
2010-01-21 | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 120 | |
2010-01-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 16 |