SD SB189 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish a fund to receive civil recoveries to offset costs incurred by riot boosting, to make a continuous appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish a fund to receive civil recoveries to offset costs incurred by riot boosting, to make a continuous appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 679
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 710
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the President S.J. 675
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 13. H.J. 680
2019-03-07HousePlaced on calendar, Passed H.J. 679
2019-03-07HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 679
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 646
2019-03-06SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 4. S.J. 629
2019-03-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-03-04SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 595

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback