SD SB189 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-06 - Intent to reconsider H.J. 642
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-06 - Intent to reconsider H.J. 642
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a tax credit to insurance companies that contribute to an organization providing educational scholarships to certain students and instructional supply grants to certain teachers and parents.
Title
Provide a tax credit to insurance companies that contribute to an organization providing educational scholarships to certain students and instructional supply grants to certain teachers and parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - House - House Placed on calendar (Y: 31 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House Taxation Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to strike the "without recommendation" (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Report out of committee without recommendation as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House Taxation Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to strike the "without recommendation" (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Report out of committee without recommendation as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-06 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 642 |
2015-03-06 | House | Placed on calendar, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 31. H.J. 642 |
2015-03-05 | House | Taxation Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 7. H.J. 607 |
2015-03-05 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 8. |
2015-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 517 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 12. S.J. 494 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 494 Amendment 189cd |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 7. S.J. 475 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Education Report out of committee without recommendation as amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 445 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 189cb |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 263 |