SD SB188 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 S.J. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 S.J. 438
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modify the time before which rural access infrastructure grant moneys must be expended or obligated.
Title
Modify the time before which rural access infrastructure grant moneys must be expended or obligated.
Sponsors
Sen. Sydney Davis [R] | Rep. Stephanie Sauder [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Sen. Casey Crabtree [R] |
Sen. Randy Deibert [R] | Rep. Eric Emery [D] | Rep. Randy Gross [R] | Rep. Mellissa Heermann [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 28, 2024 S.J. 438 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2024 S.J. 408 |
2024-02-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 393 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 390 |
2024-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 368 |
2024-02-20 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 21 |
2024-02-20 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 21 |
2024-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-02-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 305 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 287 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 287 Amendment 188B |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 191 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 182 |