SD SB188 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2023 S.J. 442
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Add a provision regarding the use of a designated refrigerant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add a provision regarding the use of a designated refrigerant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-07SenateSigned by the Governor on March 07, 2023 S.J. 442
2023-03-01SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 01, 2023 S.J. 387
2023-02-27HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 395
2023-02-24SenateSigned by the President S.J. 340
2023-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 366
2023-02-22HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 2
2023-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2023-02-14HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 292
2023-02-13SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 247
2023-02-09SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 20
2023-02-09SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 20
2023-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2023-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 160

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback