SD SB188 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 45. H.J. 701
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding state tests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding state tests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 45. H.J. 701
2019-03-06HouseEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 2. H.J. 682
2019-03-06HouseEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 188ba
2019-03-06HouseEducation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 8.
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-03-04HouseEducation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5.
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-21HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 463
2019-02-20SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 432
2019-02-14SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 379
2019-02-14SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 188ca
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 250

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=188&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB188P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB188SED.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB188HED.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28298&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28498&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29051&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29224&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29227&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29292&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29347&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback