SD SB188 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the sale and display of alcoholic beverages in certain establishments.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the sale and display of alcoholic beverages in certain establishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 610 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 15. H.J. 707 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 707 Amendment 188fa | |
2010-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 687 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 663 | |
2010-03-01 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 627 | |
2010-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-19 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 493 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 376 Amendment 188fta | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 375 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 375 Amendment 188sa | |
2010-02-16 | Commerce Title amended, Passed Amendment 188tta | |
2010-02-16 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 327 | |
2010-02-16 | Commerce Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 188tb | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 227 |