SD SB187 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establish provisions concerning the sale of adult-use retail marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish provisions concerning the sale of adult-use retail marijuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House State Affairs: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
2021-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 399
2021-02-24SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 16. S.J. 343
2021-02-24SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 343 Amendment 187B
2021-02-22SenateDeferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 313
2021-02-09SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 223
2021-02-08SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 2
2021-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-03SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 170

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback