SD SB186 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain leave policies for state employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain leave policies for state employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 534
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 581
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the President
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the President S.J. 487
2020-03-10HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 478
2020-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 14. H.J. 490
2020-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 475
2020-03-02HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4.
2020-03-02HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 186B
2020-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-27HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 421
2020-02-26HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 407
2020-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 338
2020-02-21SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2020-02-21SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
2020-02-21SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 186A
2020-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-07SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 168

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=186&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/67113.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/68313.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69074.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69872.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33465&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=33790&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34046&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34543&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34674&Session=2020

Bill Comments

feedback