SD SB186 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish Good Earth State Park at Blood Run in Lincoln County.
Title
Establish Good Earth State Park at Blood Run in Lincoln County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 757 |
2013-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 723 |
2013-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 815 |
2013-03-06 | House | Signed by President S.J. 703 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 708 |
2013-03-04 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-03-04 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 631 |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-15 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 425 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 418 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 390 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 179 |