SD SB186 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 659
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 659
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update the definition of the nonsectarian textbooks that are loaned to certain students to include digital materials.
Title
Update the definition of the nonsectarian textbooks that are loaned to certain students to include digital materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor S.J. 659 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 620 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 662 | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by President S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 3. H.J. 608 | |
2012-02-24 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 607 Amendment 186ce | |
2012-02-22 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 544 | |
2012-02-22 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 186cd | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-14 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 459 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 395 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 394 Amendment 186cc | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 334 | |
2012-02-07 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 186cta | |
2012-02-07 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 290 | |
2012-02-07 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 186ca | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 193 |