SD SB186 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 40. H.J. 581
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 40. H.J. 581
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions related to distribution of funds to sparse school districts.
Title
Revise certain provisions related to distribution of funds to sparse school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 40. H.J. 581 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 562 | |
2011-02-25 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. H.J. 528 | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 421 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 434 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 417 | |
2011-02-10 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 396 | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 245 |