SD SB185 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 7. H.J. 683
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 7. H.J. 683
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and provide for the adjustment of the per student allocation for the state aid to general education formula.
Title
Revise and provide for the adjustment of the per student allocation for the state aid to general education formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 7. H.J. 683 | |
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 649 | |
2011-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 609 | |
2011-02-28 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. H.J. 542 | |
2011-02-28 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 185ma | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 514 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 511 Amendment 185tta | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 510 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 510 Amendment 185tb | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 509 Amendment 185cb | |
2011-02-22 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 474 | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 245 |