SD SB183 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide funds to the precision agriculture fund by revising the allocation of petroleum release compensation and inspection fee revenues and online lottery revenues and to repeal the ethanol fuel fund.
Title
Provide funds to the precision agriculture fund by revising the allocation of petroleum release compensation and inspection fee revenues and online lottery revenues and to repeal the ethanol fuel fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793 |
2018-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 S.J. 780 |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 777 |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 790 |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 757 |
2018-03-07 | House | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 749 |
2018-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 13. H.J. 714 |
2018-03-06 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed H.J. 696 Amendment 183fta |
2018-03-06 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. |
2018-03-06 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 183fa |
2018-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-03-01 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 667 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 640 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed H.J. 594 Amendment 183mta |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 183mb |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 183ma |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 553 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Title amended, Passed S.J. 546 Amendment 183ota |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 183oa |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 293 |
Subjects
Appropriations
Board of Regents
Education
Public Health and Safety
Public Property, Purchases and Contracts
Taxes
Board of Regents
Education
Public Health and Safety
Public Property, Purchases and Contracts
Taxes