SD SB183 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 22. S.J. 421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 22. S.J. 421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the voting requirements regarding the issuance of bonds by public bodies and capital outlay certificates by school districts.
Title
Revise the voting requirements regarding the issuance of bonds by public bodies and capital outlay certificates by school districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Jim Peterson [D] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] |
Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Patrick Kirschman [D] | Rep. Dick Werner [R] |
Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 22. S.J. 421 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 397 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 364 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 261 |