SD SB183 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 631
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 631
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions relating to hunting trespass and to increase certain penalties for trespassing.
Title
Revise provisions relating to hunting trespass and to increase certain penalties for trespassing.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] |
Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Dean Schrempp [D] |
Roll Calls
House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | House | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 631 |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 481 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 448 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 409 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 183tb |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 183ta |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 178 |