SD SB183 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the elements of the offense of juvenile sexting and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Establish the elements of the offense of juvenile sexting and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Sen. Art Fryslie [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] |
Sen. Ried Holien [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Eldon Nygaard [D] | Sen. Russell Olson [R] |
Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] | Rep. Steve Street [D] |
Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] | Rep. Burt Tulson [R] | Sen. Mike Vehle [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Sen. Susan Wismer [D] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor S.J. 672 | |
2012-03-02 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 730 | |
2012-03-02 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 658 | |
2012-03-01 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 716 | |
2012-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 647 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 646 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 642 Amendment cc183A | |
2012-03-01 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 709 Amendment Cc183A | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 627 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 681 | |
2012-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 658 | |
2012-02-27 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 628 | |
2012-02-27 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 183ra | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-14 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 459 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 399 | |
2012-02-09 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 357 | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 192 |