SD SB183 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exclude students served in residential treatment facilities from the determination of the small school adjustment in the state aid to general education formula.
Title
Exclude students served in residential treatment facilities from the determination of the small school adjustment in the state aid to general education formula.
Sponsors
Rep. Lance Carson [R] | Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] | Rep. Noel Hamiel [R] | Sen. Dave Knudson [R] |
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2010-03-09 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 608 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 755 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by President S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 546 | |
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 631 | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 597 | |
2010-02-24 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 183cb | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 384 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 312 | |
2010-02-09 | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 183cta | |
2010-02-09 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 256 | |
2010-02-09 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 183ca | |
2010-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 226 |