SD SB182 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the special education property tax levy for school districts and to revise the state aid to special education formula.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the special education property tax levy for school districts and to revise the state aid to special education formula.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
2019-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 756
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the President S.J. 716
2019-03-12HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 4. S.J. 698
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 3. H.J. 699
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. H.J. 683
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 182ca
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 552
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 507
2019-02-21SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 457
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 413
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 232

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=182&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB182P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB182HAP.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB182ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28448&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28802&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29215&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29314&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29344&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29458&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback