SD SB181 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the transfer of funds from the budget reserve fund and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the transfer of funds from the budget reserve fund and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the President S.J. 728
2019-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 756
2019-03-13HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 0. H.J. 751
2019-03-13HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 750 Amendment Cc181a
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 734
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 2. S.J. 715
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 713 Amendment Cc181a
2019-03-12HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 699
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 6. H.J. 692
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. H.J. 651
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 181ta
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 552
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 510
2019-02-22SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 472
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 413
2019-02-20SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 181za
2019-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 231

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=181&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB181P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB181SAP.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB181HAP.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB181CNF.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB181ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28445&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28809&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29214&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29338&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29506&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29511&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback