SD SB180 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding revenues generated by and donations to the South Dakota State Veterans Cemetery, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding revenues generated by and donations to the South Dakota State Veterans Cemetery, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 492
2021-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 567
2021-03-11HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 564
2021-03-11SenateSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 477
2021-03-10HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-03-10HouseMotion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. Amendment 180D
2021-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 541
2021-03-09SenateSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 461
2021-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 508
2021-03-08HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar H.J. 508
2021-03-03HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-03-03HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-03-03HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 180C
2021-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25HouseReferred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 400
2021-02-23HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 357
2021-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 307
2021-02-18SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 297
2021-02-11SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-02-11SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 180B
2021-02-11SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 2 Amendment 180A
2021-02-11SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-03SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 171

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/22014
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/215851.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/217526.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219669.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/220267.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/220272.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216775.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/217355.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219270.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/220058.pdf
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/69097
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/69690
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70696
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70862
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/71022
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/71080
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/71113

Bill Comments 750

feedback