SD SB180 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
2019-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 756
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the President S.J. 729
2019-03-13HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 1. H.J. 754
2019-03-13HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 753
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on calendar, Passed H.J. 753
2019-03-12SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 3. S.J. 726
2019-03-12SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. S.J. 718
2019-03-12SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 180tc
2019-03-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-03-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-03-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 231

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback