SD SB180 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 731
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 731
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the production tax for wind energy facilities and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the production tax for wind energy facilities and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 731 |
2015-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 719 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 770 |
2015-03-12 | House | Signed by President S.J. 711 |
2015-03-11 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 676 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 684 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 683 Amendment 180fc |
2015-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 669 |
2015-03-05 | House | Taxation Title amended, Passed H.J. 604 Amendment 180fta |
2015-03-05 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. |
2015-03-05 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 180fb |
2015-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 540 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 515 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 485 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 180ra |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 261 |