SD SB18 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 S.J. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 S.J. 380
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the South Dakota Board of Technical Education.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the South Dakota Board of Technical Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 S.J. 380 |
2018-02-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 01, 2018 S.J. 317 |
2018-01-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 266 |
2018-01-30 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 279 |
2018-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 210 |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-24 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 164 |
2018-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 92 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 122 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 89 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 15 |