SD SB178 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to the Department of Game, Fish and Parks to fund certain improvements to Palisades State Park and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to the Department of Game, Fish and Parks to fund certain improvements to Palisades State Park and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
2019-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 756
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the President S.J. 716
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 10. H.J. 727
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 720 Amendment Cc178a
2019-03-12HousePlaced on calendar, Passed H.J. 725
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 7. S.J. 697
2019-03-12HouseSenate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 6. S.J. 697
2019-03-12HouseIntent to reconsider S.J. 695
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Failed, YEAS 19, NAYS 13. S.J. 695
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 688 Amendment Cc178a
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 696
2019-03-07HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 661
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 16. H.J. 643
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 643 Amendment 178tb
2019-03-04HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 604
2019-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 5. S.J. 555
2019-02-27SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 1. S.J. 535
2019-02-27SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 178ja
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 231

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=178&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB178P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB178JAP.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB178H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB178CNF.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB178ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28929&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29032&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29193&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29440&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29447&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29448&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29457&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback