SD SB178 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide certain exceptions from alcoholic beverage provisions regarding events conducted by certain civic, charitable, educational, fraternal, or veterans organizations.
Title
Provide certain exceptions from alcoholic beverage provisions regarding events conducted by certain civic, charitable, educational, fraternal, or veterans organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Terri Haverly [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] |
Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Tom Holmes [R] | Sen. David Johnson [R] |
Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] | Rep. Jason Kettwig [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] |
Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793 |
2018-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 S.J. 776 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 749 |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 688 |
2018-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 9. H.J. 649 |
2018-02-26 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 596 |
2018-02-26 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 178db |
2018-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 552 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 533 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 500 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 477 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 292 |