SD SB178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2017 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2017 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Title
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2017 S.J. 747 |
2017-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743 |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 744 |
2017-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 759 |
2017-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 758 |
2017-03-10 | House | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 741 |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading House H.J. 757 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 741 |