SD SB176 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2019 S.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for the second century habitat fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for the second century habitat fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Approval of style and form veto (Y: 41 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Approval of style and form veto (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 40 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2019 S.J. 742
2019-03-29HouseDelivered Style and Form S.J. 740
2019-03-29HouseApproval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 25. H.J. 765
2019-03-29HouseApproval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 7. S.J. 735
2019-03-29HouseVetoed for Style and Form S.J. 734
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the President S.J. 728
2019-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 756
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 14. H.J. 746
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 743 Amendment Cc176a
2019-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 734
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 6. S.J. 714
2019-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 710 Amendment Cc176a
2019-03-12HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 699
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 689 Amendment 176xta
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 19. H.J. 689
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 689 Amendment 176xa
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 26. H.J. 687
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 42, NAYS 24. H.J. 687
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 15. H.J. 686 Amendment 176jb
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 686 Amendment 176zd
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 664
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 17. H.J. 645
2019-03-05HouseImmediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1) H.J. 643
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 43, NAYS 21. H.J. 643
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 36, NAYS 28. H.J. 641
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 641 Amendment 176tb
2019-03-04HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 604
2019-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 9. S.J. 555
2019-02-27SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 3. S.J. 534
2019-02-27SenateAmend the amendment, Passed Amendment 176zb
2019-02-27SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 176za
2019-02-27SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 176ja
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 230

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=176&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB176P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB176JAP.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB176H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB176CNF.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB176ENR.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB176ENR2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28913&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29028&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29190&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29192&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29196&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29326&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29327&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29329&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29330&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29493&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29497&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29529&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29537&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback