SD SB176 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 S.J. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Preserve the use of public land, to ensure free travel, to enhance emergency response, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preserve the use of public land, to ensure free travel, to enhance emergency response, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor on March 13, 2017 S.J. 746
2017-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743
2017-03-10HouseSigned by the President S.J. 742
2017-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 759
2017-03-10HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 730
2017-03-09HouseSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 716
2017-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 737
2017-03-09HouseImmediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1) H.J. 734
2017-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Failed, YEAS 45, NAYS 22. H.J. 733
2017-03-09HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 707 Amendment Cc176a
2017-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 728 Amendment Cc176a
2017-03-08HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 716
2017-03-08HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 679
2017-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 18. H.J. 696
2017-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 696 Amendment 176ca
2017-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 19. H.J. 695
2017-03-07HouseIntent to reconsider, Passed H.J. 693
2017-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 40, NAYS 27. H.J. 693
2017-03-06HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2.
2017-03-06HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 176ff
2017-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-24HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 536
2017-02-23SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 531
2017-02-23SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 531 Amendment 176xa
2017-02-23SenateImmediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1) S.J. 531
2017-02-23SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 530
2017-02-22SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3.
2017-02-22SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 176ob
2017-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-15SenateDeferred by Chair
2017-02-15SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 176oa
2017-02-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-13SenateDeferred by Chair
2017-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Senate State Affairs, Passed S.J. 340
2017-02-08SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 337
2017-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-03SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 296

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=176&Session=2017
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB176P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB176SST.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB176S.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB176HST.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB176H.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB176CNF.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB176ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23016&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23543&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23659&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23661&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24058&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24179&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24181&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24182&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24273&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24281&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24308&Session=2017&Session=2017

Bill Comments

feedback