SD SB173 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to fund certain health care innovation grants, to require certain reports, expedite the nursing home rate methodology review, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to fund certain health care innovation grants, to require certain reports, expedite the nursing home rate methodology review, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-06HouseSigned by the President S.J. 637
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 640
2019-03-04HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 603
2019-02-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 554
2019-02-27SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed S.J. 534 Amendment 173ztb
2019-02-27SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0.
2019-02-27SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 173zb
2019-02-27SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 230

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback