SD SB173 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish certain provisions regarding microbreweries and malt beverage manufacturers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish certain provisions regarding microbreweries and malt beverage manufacturers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseSigned by the Governor on March 22, 2018 S.J. 793
2018-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 S.J. 776
2018-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 760
2018-03-07HouseSigned by the President S.J. 749
2018-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 711
2018-03-05HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 679
2018-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-02-23HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 577
2018-02-22SenateSenate Title amended, Passed S.J. 567 Amendment 173ota
2018-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 567
2018-02-22SenateSenate Hoghoused, Passed S.J. 562 Amendment 173ob
2018-02-20SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 500
2018-02-12SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 431
2018-02-08SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 422
2018-02-07SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 397
2018-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 247

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback