SD SB173 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make appropriations from the water and environment fund, the water pollution control revolving fund subfund, and the drinking water revolving fund subfund for various water and environmental purposes, to revise the state water plan, to increase the authority of the South Dakota Board of Water and Natural Resources to make consolidated water facilities construction program awards, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make appropriations from the water and environment fund, the water pollution control revolving fund subfund, and the drinking water revolving fund subfund for various water and environmental purposes, to revise the state water plan, to increase the authority of the South Dakota Board of Water and Natural Resources to make consolidated water facilities construction program awards, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-13HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 714
2015-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 646
2015-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 670
2015-03-06HouseSigned by President S.J. 628
2015-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 614
2015-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 600
2015-03-03HouseAppropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 562
2015-02-18HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 430
2015-02-17SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 419
2015-02-12SenateAppropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 388
2015-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 249

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback