SD SB173 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allow specific details of alleged sex crimes against minors be suppressed under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow specific details of alleged sex crimes against minors be suppressed under certain conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-28 Signed by Governor S.J. 706
2011-03-11 Delivered to the Governor S.J. 692
2011-03-10 Signed by Speaker H.J. 727
2011-03-09 Signed by President S.J. 677
2011-03-09 Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 669
2011-03-07 House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 642
2011-03-03 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 620
2011-03-02 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 609
2011-02-28 Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 544
2011-02-28 Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 173ra
2011-02-28 Scheduled for hearing
2011-02-15 First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 395
2011-02-14 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 422
2011-02-10 Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 398
2011-02-10 Scheduled for hearing
2011-01-31 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 242

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback