SD SB172 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Title
Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619 |
2016-03-29 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2016 S.J. 628 |
2016-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 12. H.J. 876 |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 876 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 614 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 613 |
2016-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 878 |
2016-03-11 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 615 |