SD SB171 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 25, NAYS 43. H.J. 830
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 25, NAYS 43. H.J. 830
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the limited use of certain types of medical marijuana.
Title
Authorize the limited use of certain types of medical marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 25, NAYS 43. H.J. 830 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 805 |
2016-03-03 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 774 |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-03-01 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 665 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 417 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 374 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 171ra |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 233 |