SD SB171 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 58-16)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 58-16)
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize certain federal forms as sufficient to direct the disposition of the body of a servicemember.
Title
Recognize certain federal forms as sufficient to direct the disposition of the body of a servicemember.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 |
2014-03-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568 |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 660 |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by President S.J. 540 |
2014-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 608 |
2014-02-27 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-27 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 589 |
2014-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-20 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 470 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 367 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 326 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 171ta |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 199 |