SD SB171 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 422
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 422
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a runoff election under certain circumstances when errors have been made to the ballot printing or by the person in charge of the election.
Title
Provide for a runoff election under certain circumstances when errors have been made to the ballot printing or by the person in charge of the election.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Rep. Steve Hickey [R] | Sen. Shantel Krebs [R] |
Sen. Eldon Nygaard [D] | Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] | Rep. David Sigdestad [D] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Reconsidered (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Reconsidered (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 422 | |
2012-02-13 | Local Government Title amended, Passed Amendment 171ftb | |
2012-02-13 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 378 | |
2012-02-13 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 171fb | |
2012-02-13 | Local Government Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. | |
2012-02-01 | Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 240 | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 175 |