SD SB17 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the South Dakota Department of Corrections to purchase certain real property, to make an appropriation, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the South Dakota Department of Corrections to purchase certain real property, to make an appropriation, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Recommend Referral to (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Recommend Referral to (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476 |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 465 |
2021-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 509 |
2021-03-04 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 494 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 398 |
2021-03-02 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-02 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2021-03-01 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2021-02-11 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 101 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | State Affairs Recommend Referral to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16 |