SD SB169 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Signed by the Governor on March 05, 2024 S.J. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Signed by the Governor on March 05, 2024 S.J. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding drones.
Title
Revise provisions regarding drones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 05, 2024 S.J. 482 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2024 S.J. 422 |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 407 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 405 |
2024-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 375 |
2024-02-21 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 367 |
2024-02-20 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 22 |
2024-02-20 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 22 |
2024-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-02-13 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 319 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 298 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 169B |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 182 |