SD SB169 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to child pornography and to revise the penalty therefor.
Title
Revise provisions related to child pornography and to revise the penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 S.J. 619 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 817 |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-07 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 785 |
2016-03-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 700 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 430 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 408 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 169fa |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 217 |