SD SB168 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize criminal background checks for certain officers and employees of the Governor's Office of Economic Development.
Title
Authorize criminal background checks for certain officers and employees of the Governor's Office of Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 773 |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670 |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by President S.J. 653 |
2014-03-12 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 642 |
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 703 |
2014-03-10 | House | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 168sta |
2014-03-10 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 678 |
2014-03-10 | House | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 168sa |
2014-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 534 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 441 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 401 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 199 |